CA AB3035 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 599aa of the Penal Code, relating to animal welfare.
Title
Animal welfare.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 3035 Patterson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 4679.) |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 599 | Amended Code | Citation Text |