CA AB3030 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 21080.48 to the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: exemption: qualified opportunity zones.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 3030 CABALLERO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Employment] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 3030 CABALLERO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Employment] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 11. Page 5586.) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 9). |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to Com. on L. & E.) |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4773.) |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. & E. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21080.48 | New Code | See Bill Text |