CA AB303 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 828 of, to add the heading of Article 1 (commencing with Section 825) to Chapter 4 of Division 1 of, to add and repeal Article 2 (commencing with Section 845) of Chapter 4 of Division 1 of, and to repeal and add Sections 829 and 830 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to aquaculture.
Title
Aquaculture: mariculture production and restoration: pilot program.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Rivas [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] |
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 25. |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 825 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 828 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 845 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |