CA AB3029 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17053.73 and 23626 of, and to add and repeal Sections 17053.76 and 23626.5 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxes: credits: employment: California New Employment Credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.) |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 14). |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.73 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.76 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23626 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23626.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |