CA AB3027 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 21177.8 to the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Environmental Quality Act: attorney’s fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
2018-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-04-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code21177.8New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback