CA AB3022 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 772, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 772, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51430 of the Education Code, relating to high school diplomas.
Title
Retroactive grant of high school diplomas: departed and deported pupils.
Sponsors
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] |
Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] | Sen. Monique Limon [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-20 - Assembly - AB 3022 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3022 Gonzalez Fletcher By Lara (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Assembly - AB 3022 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3022 Gonzalez Fletcher By Lara (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Assembly - AB 3022 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 772, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 6379.). |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 5276.). |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 2. Page 5253.) |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51430 | Amended Code | Citation Text |