CA AB3019 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 268, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2025.220 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to depositions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deposition notices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3019 Reyes et al. By Jackson (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 3019 REYES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-05 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 268, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-05 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-30AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2018-08-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5696.).
2018-06-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 12).
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 9. Page 5162.)
2018-05-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2018-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-16AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code6034.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Code of Civil Procedure2025.220Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback