CA AB3015 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 13978.9 to the Government Code, and to add Section 38592.7 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
Marine terminal operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.) |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13978.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 38592.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |