CA AB3012 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 258, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 258, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 678, 1063.1, 1063.5, 1063.14, 2051.5, 2060, 10095, and 10103.7 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Residential property insurance.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Daly [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 3012 Wood Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3012 Wood et al. By Dodd (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 3012 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3012 Wood et al. By Dodd (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 3012 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 258, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5344.). |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4351.). |
2020-08-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 4). |
2020-07-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2020-07-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4749.) |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10095 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10103.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1063.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1063.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1063.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 2051.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 2060 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 678 | Amended Code | Citation Text |