CA AB301 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 15250.2 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Commercial motor vehicles: examination requirements: driving skills test.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 301 RODRIGUEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - ? (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 301 RODRIGUEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - ? (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1926.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 12804.16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 12804.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 15250.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |