CA AB3009 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Quirk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Quirk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 11.3 (commencing with Section 25235) to Chapter 6.5 of Division 20 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous materials, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Hazardous materials: lead-based paint.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] |
Asm. David Chiu [D] | Sen. Monique Limon [D] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Quirk. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25). |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 30). |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2018-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and REV. & TAX. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 100825 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25235 | New Code | See Bill Text |