CA AB3007 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Eduardo Garcia.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 19 (commencing with Section 18999.9) to Part 6 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children of incarcerated parents: support and services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB3007 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Assembly - AB 3007 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-09AssemblyOrdered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Eduardo Garcia.
2018-07-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-07-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5037.).
2018-06-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20).
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-06-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HEALTH.
2018-04-19SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-19AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4787.)
2018-04-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-12AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10).
2018-03-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2018-03-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16501.85New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18999.9New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback