CA AB3001 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 25402.1 of, and to add Section 25403 to, the Public Resources Code, and to add Section 380.7 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Zero-emissions buildings and sources of heat energy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-04-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & E.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code25402Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code25402.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code25403New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code12819Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code16480Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code380.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code380.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code740.18New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback