CA AB300 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 66473.7 of the Government Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 10910 of the Water Code, relating to subdivision map approvals.
Title
Subdivisions: water supply.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Natural Resources and Water. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - AB 300 CABALLERO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - AB 300 CABALLERO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-30 | From Senate committee without further action. | |
2009-07-07 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |
2009-06-30 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2009-06-23 | Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2009-06-22 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17). | |
2009-06-10 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and N.R. & W. | |
2009-05-28 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1742.) | |
2009-05-26 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-21 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20). | |
2009-04-29 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 28). | |
2009-04-21 | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | |
2009-04-20 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-16 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 15). | |
2009-04-13 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2009-04-02 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-04 | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and W.,P. & W. | |
2009-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 66473.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 10910 | New Code | See Bill Text |