CA AB2998 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 29 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 5.5 (commencing with Section 19100) to Chapter 3 of Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to business.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer products: flame retardant materials.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2998 BLOOM Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2998 Bloom et al. By Mitchell (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2998 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-07AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-27SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-08-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-22SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-21SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
2018-08-13SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-07-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 25).
2018-06-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Coms. on EQ. and B., P. & E.D.
2018-05-31SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 12. Page 5467.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
2018-05-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2018-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2018-04-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and P. & C.P.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code19100New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback