CA AB2996 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Article 6.6 (commencing with Section 217.10) of Chapter 1 of Division 1 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation public contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Transportation: Job order contracting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-05-09AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-02AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Streets and Highways Code217.10Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback