CA AB2994 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 18941.12 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to building standards.
Title
Building standards: public restroom stalls: disability access.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2994 HOLDEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2994 Holden By Portantino (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2994 HOLDEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2994 Holden By Portantino (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2994 HOLDEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-21 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6823.). |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5697.). |
2018-08-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 6). |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5218.) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 18941.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 19952.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |