CA AB299 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 224, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 3019.5 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vote by mail ballot tracking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB299 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Assembly - AB 299 Salas Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-05 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 224, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-05 Approved by the Governor.
2019-08-27 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-08-22 In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-08-22 Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-08-12 In Senate. Held at Desk.
2019-07-11 Ordered to the Senate.
2019-07-11 Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly.
2019-07-11 Action rescinded whereby bill was ordered to enrollment and whereby the bill was enrolled and presented to the Governor.
2019-07-08AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-07-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-07-01SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1876.).
2019-06-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-24SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-30SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2019-03-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-03-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 918.)
2019-03-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-03-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 20).
2019-03-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-14AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-03-13AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 13).
2019-02-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-01-29AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
2019-01-28AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code3019.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback