CA AB2989 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 552, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 552, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21235 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Motorized scooter: use of helmet: maximum speed.
Sponsors
Asm. Heath Flora [R] | Asm. Phillip Chen [R] | Asm. Todd Gloria [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2989 FLORA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2989 Flora et al. By Cannella (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2989 FLORA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2989 Flora et al. By Cannella (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2989 FLORA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 552, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6808.). |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 5653.). |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 5541.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25). |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 21113 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 21203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 21209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 21210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 21212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 21235 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 407.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 4150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 543.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |