CA AB2986 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 286, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 5445.1 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation network companies: disclosure of participating driver information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2986 Cunningham et al. By Cannella (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2986 CUNNINGHAM Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-06 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 286, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-06 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-27AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5512.).
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Coms. on T. & H. and E., U. & C.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5217.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on C. & C.
2018-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-11AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on C. & C.
2018-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-02AssemblyReferred to Coms. on C. & C. and PUB. S.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code8504.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code5445.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code5445.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback