CA AB2982 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 9 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 125050 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

North County Transit District: City of San Diego.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2982 Gloria By Bates (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 2982 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-14AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-05-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 20. Page 5164.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 9).
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code125050Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code27202.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback