CA AB2980 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 26001 and 26051.5 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis: premises: common space.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2980 GIPSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2980 Gipson By Portantino (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2980 Gipson By Portantino Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2980 Gipson By Portantino (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2980 GIPSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-29 Vetoed by Governor.
2018-09-07AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 6909.).
2018-08-29AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6773.)
2018-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 5901.).
2018-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-21SenateOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-21SenateReconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5569.)
2018-08-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 5567.).
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 21. Page 5207.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 9).
2018-04-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code26001Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26051.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback