CA AB2975 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 221, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 221, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5093.71 to the Public Resources Code, relating to wild and scenic rivers.
Title
Wild and scenic rivers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2975 Friedman et al. By Allen (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2975 FRIEDMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2975 FRIEDMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 221, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-08-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 8. Page 5240.). |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 5586.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5363.) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 9). |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 5093.71 | New Code | See Bill Text |