CA AB2974 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14206 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to workforce development.
Title
Workforce development: local workforce development board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and J., E.D., & E. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23689 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 14206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |