CA AB2973 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 830, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 65961 of, and to add Section 66452.26 to, the Government Code, relating to land use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land use: Subdivision Map Act: expiration dates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2973 GRAY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2973 Gray By Galgiani (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2973 GRAY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 830, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-27 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-12AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
2018-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2018-08-29SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5962.).
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-07-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5217.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65961Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code66452.26New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback