CA AB2970 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 18009.3, 18300, 18420, and 18550.1 of, and to add Section 18701 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
Mobilehome parks and manufactured housing communities: omnibus bill.
Sponsors
Asm. Chad Mayes [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 18009.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 18300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 18420 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 18550.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 18701 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2970 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2970 |