CA AB297 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 186, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 23396.2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages: licenses: wine and food cultural museum and educational center.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB297 Levine et al. By Dodd (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 297 LEVINE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 186, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-01 Approved by the Governor.
2017-08-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-08-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2178.).
2017-07-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-07-10SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-01SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-05-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1616.)
2017-05-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
2017-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-02-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-02-07AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
2017-02-06AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code23396.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback