CA AB2969 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 105, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 6728 to the Government Code, relating to LGBT Pride Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LGBT Pride Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2969 Low et al. By Lara (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 2969 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-16 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 105, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-16 Approved by the Governor.
2018-07-03AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
2018-06-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-06-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 4975.).
2018-06-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-05-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 0. Page 5159.)
2018-05-07AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 2).
2018-05-03AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code6728New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback