CA AB2968 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 778, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 337 and 728 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Psychotherapist-client relationship: victims of sexual behavior and sexual contact: informational brochure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Assembly - AB 2968 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2968 Levine By Galgiani (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2968 LEVINE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-26 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 778, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-26 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-06AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-28AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6723.).
2018-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5514.).
2018-08-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-14SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5217.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback