CA AB2962 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 68511.3 to the Government Code, relating to courts.
Title
Court records: fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2962 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2962 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-07-27 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2022-06-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5036.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 8. |
2022-03-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 68511.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |