CA AB2958 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-07 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 11123.5 to the Government Code, relating to state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State bodies: meetings: teleconference.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2958 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5206.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-25AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 18).
2018-04-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-04AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code11123Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code11123.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback