CA AB2957 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 16 (commencing with Section 92990) to Part 57 of Division 9 of Title 3 of the Education Code, and to add Section 23605 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to water.
Title
Water: University of California: California Institute for Water Innovation and Technology: corporate income taxes: credit: water technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 23). |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and REV. & TAX. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 78056 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 92990 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23605 | New Code | See Bill Text |