CA AB2955 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 443, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 443, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2783 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Worker classification: commercial fishing industry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2955 L. & E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By KALRA (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2955 L. & E. (Kalra) By Cortese (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2955 L. & E. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2955 L. & E. (Kalra) By Cortese (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2955 L. & E. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 443, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 29). |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4904.). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4741.) |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11). |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2022-02-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 2783 | Amended Code | Citation Text |