CA AB2955 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 398, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 398, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 22353.2, 22353.3, and 22353.4 to the Vehicle Code, relating to traffic.
Title
Traffic: Cities of Burbank, Glendale, and Los Angeles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-20 - Assembly - AB 2955 FRIEDMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2955 Friedman et al. By Portantino (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2955 FRIEDMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2955 Friedman et al. By Portantino (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2955 FRIEDMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 398, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6378.). |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5292.). |
2018-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2018-06-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5239.) |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5200.) |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 22353.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 22353.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 22353.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |