CA AB295 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 66014.1 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: pilot program for free cost of education: working group.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-20 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Assembly - AB 295 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Assembly - AB 295 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 1). |
2022-05-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 4. Page 3398.) |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (January 20). |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 21. |
2021-01-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66014.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |