CA AB295 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on September 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-06 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-06 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12389 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance: underwritten title companies.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Daly [D] | Sen. John Moorlach [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-22 - Assembly - Noes Count (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Assembly - AB 295 Daly Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB295 Daly et al. By Roth (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 295 Daly Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Assembly - AB 295 Daly Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB295 Daly et al. By Roth (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 295 Daly Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-06 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2019-09-09 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2019-09-09 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2801.). |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 21). |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2137.). |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2019-05-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1589.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 12389 | Amended Code | Citation Text |