CA AB2941 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 196, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1368.7 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10112.95 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care coverage: state of emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-09 - Assembly - AB 2941 BERMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2941 Berman By Dodd (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2941 BERMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 196, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-24 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-14AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6210.).
2018-08-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5163.).
2018-07-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
2018-06-19SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-18SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13).
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5217.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-18AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-17AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 10).
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1368.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code10112.95New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback