CA AB2937 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
Pending: Assembly Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
Pending: Assembly Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 31726, 31726.5, and 31838 of the Government Code, relating to county employees’ retirement.
Title
CERL: non-service-connected disability retirement.
Sponsors
Asm. Vince Fong [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 31726 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31726.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31838 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2937 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2937 |