CA AB2932 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-31 - Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 22162.9 to the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Long Beach: design-build process.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-29 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 2932 O'Donnell Third Reading Urgency (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-31SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2020-07-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 29).
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2020-06-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-15AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.).
2020-06-10AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2020-05-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-05-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 12).
2020-03-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2020-02-24AssemblyRead first time.
2020-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2020-02-21AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Contract Code22162.9New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback