CA AB293 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Hearing: Mar 25 @ 2:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 447
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 38591.1 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Greenhouse gases: offset protocols.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-02-26AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2019-02-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-01-29AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
2019-01-28AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code38591.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback