CA AB2928 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 44125.5 of the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 17137 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to air pollution.
Title
Personal income taxes: Clean Cars 4 All Program: retirement and replacement.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Cooper [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44125.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17137 | New Code | See Bill Text |