CA AB2926 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-20 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-20 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 1569.47 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to referral agencies.
Title
Referral agencies for residential care facilities for the elderly: duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2926 Calderon Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2926 Calderon Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-20 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2020-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 10). |
2020-07-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4690.) |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2). |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1569.47 | New Code | See Bill Text |