CA AB2925 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 16. Noes 36. Page 5655.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 16. Noes 36. Page 5655.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1946.2 to the Civil Code, relating to tenancy.
Title
Tenancy: eviction: for cause.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2925 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 36 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 16. Noes 36. Page 5655.). |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5435.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 5434.) |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 1). |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1946.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |