CA AB2923 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 1000, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Sections 29010.1, 29010.6, 29010.7, 29010.8, 29010.9, 29010.10, 29010.11, and 29010.12 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

San Francisco Bay Area Rapid Transit District: transit-oriented development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Assembly - AB 2923 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 46 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2923 Chiu et al. By McGuire (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2923 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 1000, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-06AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-28AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 28. Page 6731.).
2018-08-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-23SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5647.).
2018-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
2018-08-13SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-07-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 27).
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-06-20SenateReferred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
2018-06-13SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 32. Page 5634.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
2018-05-25AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.)
2018-05-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-30AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 23).
2018-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-04-19AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-04-16Assembly(pending re-referral to Com. on NAT. RES.)
2018-04-16AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4674.)
2018-04-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and NAT. RES.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback