CA AB2923 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 1000, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 1000, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 29010.1, 29010.6, 29010.7, 29010.8, 29010.9, 29010.10, 29010.11, and 29010.12 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
San Francisco Bay Area Rapid Transit District: transit-oriented development.
Sponsors
Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Tim Grayson [D] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-28 - Assembly - AB 2923 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 46 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2923 Chiu et al. By McGuire (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2923 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2923 Chiu et al. By McGuire (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2923 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 1000, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 28. Page 6731.). |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5647.). |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). |
2018-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 27). |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 32. Page 5634.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25). |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.) |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 23). |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | (pending re-referral to Com. on NAT. RES.) |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4674.) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and NAT. RES. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 28765.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 28765.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 29010.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 29010.10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 29010.11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 29010.12 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 29010.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 29010.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 29010.8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 29010.9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |