CA AB2921 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 6.4 (commencing with Section 42385) to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Packaging Recovery and Recycling Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-04-05AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code42370New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code42385New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback