CA AB2921 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6.4 (commencing with Section 42385) to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling.
Title
Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Packaging Recovery and Recycling Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Autumn Burke [D] | Asm. Jim Cooper [D] | Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
Asm. Todd Gloria [D] | Asm. Tim Grayson [D] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Richard Roth [D] | Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] | Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42370 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42385 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2921 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2921 |