CA AB2920 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 771, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 67962, 67964, 67970, 67972, 67976, and 67978 of, to repeal Section 67969 of, and to repeal and add Section 67968 of, the Government Code, and to add Chapter 3.92 (commencing with Section 7299) to Part 1.7 of Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transactions and use taxes: North Lake Tahoe Transportation Authority and City of Berkeley.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-23 - Assembly - AB 2920 THURMOND Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2920 Thurmond By McGuire (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 2920 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committees on [Local Government] and [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-26 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 771, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-26 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-29AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-23AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6512.).
2018-08-20AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 20).
2018-08-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 5231.).
2018-06-28SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 26).
2018-06-21SenateRe-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-06-06SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-05-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 29. Page 5161.)
2018-05-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (May 7).
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-04-16AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-04-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-04-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2018-04-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2018-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback