CA AB2917 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 897, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 897, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 55.32 of the Civil Code, and to amend Section 14985.6 of the Government Code, relating to disability access.
Title
Disability access: internet websites, parking lots, and exterior paths of travel.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Fong [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-22 - Assembly - AB 2917 Mike Fong Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2917 Mike Fong By Umberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2917 Mike Fong Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2917 Mike Fong By Umberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2917 Mike Fong Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 897, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-29 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4874.). |
2022-08-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 4574.) |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 55.32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14985.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |