CA AB2915 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on August 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 240, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on August 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 240, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12012.79 to the Government Code, relating to tribal gaming, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Tribal gaming: compact ratification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2915 GARCIA, E. Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2915 Eduardo Garcia By Hall Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2915 G.O. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2915 Eduardo Garcia By Hall Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2915 G.O. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 240, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-08-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6302.). |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5231.). |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-08-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4792.) |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (May 5). |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4614.) |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-03-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 17. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |